Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/30/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/18/2003