Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/15/2004