Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/09/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/08/2004