There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States restoring religious freedom.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/09/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/09/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/07/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/11/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/24/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/14/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/09/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution05/05/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.46.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.46. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2003)

Constitutional Amendment - States that people retain the right to pray and to recognize their religious beliefs, heritage, and traditions on public property, including schools.

States that the United States and the States shall not establish any official religion nor require any person to join in prayer or religious activity.