Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/03/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/04/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004