Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/11/2003 Became Public Law No: 108-122. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2003 Signed by President.
10/30/2003 Presented to President.
10/23/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9238)
04/11/2003 Introduced in House