Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/24/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/06/2004