Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/26/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/30/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/08/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/2004