Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (09/30/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 25, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Makes continuing appropriations for FY 2004.

Appropriates amounts for continuing, at the current rate of operations, projects or activities which were conducted in FY 2003 and for which appropriations, funds, or other authority was made available in the: (1) Agricultural, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003; (2) Departments of Commerce, Justice, and State, the Judiciary, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003; (3) District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2003; (4) Energy and Water Development Appropriations Act, 2003; (5) Foreign Operations, Export Financing, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2003; (6) Department of the Interior and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003; (7) Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003; (8) Military Construction Appropriations Act, 2003; (9) Department of Transportation and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003; (10) Treasury and General Government Appropriations Act, 2003; and (11) Departments of Veterans Affairs and Housing and Urban Development, and Independent Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003.

(Sec. 106) Amends the Consolidated Appropriations Resolution, 2003 to: (1) increase the amount of funds made available from July 1, 2003, until September 30, 2004, for a program of education for the disabled; and (2) decrease by a corresponding amount funds made available from October 1, 2003, until September 30, 2004, for such program.

(Sec. 107) Provides funding under this resolution until the earliest of: (1) enactment of an appropriation for any project or activity provided for in this joint resolution; (2) enactment of the applicable appropriations Act without any provision for such project or activity; or (3) October 31, 2003.

(Sec. 113) Continues, until the date specified in section 107: (1) increases in military imminent danger special pay and the family separation allowance; (2) specified franchise fund pilot programs; (3) international development investment authority under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961; (4) the development company debenture and small business investment company programs under the Small Business Investment Act of 1958; and (5) the collection and use of maintenance fees authorized by the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act (while continuing through such date the prohibition against the collection of other fees under such Act).

(Sec. 121) Provides a $3.8 billion limit on new loan guarantee commitments of the Federal Housing Administration, General and Special Risk Insurance Fund, for the period covered by this joint resolution.

(Sec. 122) Continues for the period covered by this joint resolution funds made available in accordance with the Compacts of Free Association between the U.S. Government and the Governments of the Marshall Islands and Micronesia.

(Sec. 123) Earmarks funds made available herein to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for: (1) a Virgin River water rights and habitat acquisition program; and (2) the Shivwits Band Trust Fund.

(Sec. 125) Makes amounts provided in this joint resolution and prior appropriations Acts from the Airport and Airway Trust Fund available for FY 2004 for expenditures to meet Fund obligations.

(Sec. 126) Continues the availability of funding for administrative expenses of the: (1) Federal Highway Administration; (2) Bureau of Transportation Statistics; (3) Federal Transit Administration; (4) National Highway Traffic Safety Administration; and (5) Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration.

(Sec. 131) Requires amounts to continue to be appropriated or credited to the Airport and Airway Trust Fund and the Highway Trust Fund after the date of any expenditure pursuant to this Act.

(Sec. 132) States that provisions of this Act that would change direct spending or receipts under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) were they included in an Act other than an appropriations Act shall be treated as direct spending or receipts (and therefore not as emergency expenditures) under such Act.

(Sec. 133) Authorizes during FY 2004 direct loans under the Arms Export Control Act to be made available to the Czech Republic, with a gross obligation limit of $550 million.

(Sec. 134) Continues in effect through the date specified in section 107 certain provisions of the: (1) Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act; and (2) Commodity Distribution Reform Act and WIC Amendments of 1987.

(Sec. 135) Amends the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2003 to extend through October 31, 2003, the waiver, after a specified certification from the President, of certain conditions on the planning, design, or construction of a chemical weapons destruction facility in Russia.