Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/26/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/26/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/26/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/17/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/23/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/23/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/17/2004