There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Continuing Appropriations resolution FY2004 (Fifth) (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year 2004, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/16/2003Became Public Law No: 108-185. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2003Signed by President.
12/12/2003Presented to President.
12/09/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S16212)
12/08/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12865)
12/08/2003Committee on Appropriations discharged.
12/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/16/2003Became Public Law No: 108-185. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2003Signed by President.
12/12/2003HousePresented to President.
12/10/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S16212)
12/09/2003SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/08/2003-5:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2003-5:23pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H12865)
12/08/2003-5:21pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12865)
12/08/2003-5:21pmHouseMr. Young (FL) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/08/2003HouseCommittee on Appropriations discharged.
12/08/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
12/08/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations12/08/2003 Referred to
12/08/2003 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.82. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-185 (12/16/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the law making continuing appropriations for FY 2004 (the law) to increase from $3.8 billion to $7.667 billion the limitation on new loan guarantee commitments of the Federal Housing Administration (FHA), General and Special Risk Insurance Fund, for the period of applicability of the law. Allows such increase only: (1) after a certification by the Director of the Office of Personnel Management to the congressional appropriations committees that the use of such authority will not result in loan guarantee commitments for all of FY 2004 at a level in excess of the limitation set forth in the FY 2003 appropriations Act, and that the apportionment of loan commitment authority provided for the Fund and the FHA Mutual Mortgage Insurance Fund is in compliance with the terms and conditions set forth in the law; (2) if the authority for such increase applies only to new commitments issued after the enactment of this Act; and (3) if nothing in this Act is construed to pardon or release a Government officer or employee for violations of Federal law prohibiting an officer or employee from expending amounts in excess of appropriated amounts or expending sequestered amounts (the Antideficiency Act) or other applicable laws.

Amends the law making continuing appropriations to provide a $141.4 million rate of operations for the Federal Aviation Administration Operations Account Staff Offices line of business.