Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/28/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/28/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/28/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 01/28/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/03/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/03/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/03/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/03/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/04/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2004