Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/29/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/30/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/30/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/10/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/10/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/10/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/10/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/18/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/01/2004