Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2003