Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 06/02/2003