There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals ruling in Newdow v. United States Congress is inconsistent with the Supreme Court's interpretation of the first amendment and should be overturned, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/20/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 7, 15 Present (Roll no. 77).(text: CR 3/19/2003 H1976-1977)
03/18/2003Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-41.
03/06/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
03/20/2003-10:57amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/20/2003-10:57amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 7, 15 Present (Roll no. 77). (text: CR 3/19/2003 H1976-1977)
03/20/2003-10:49amConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2137)
03/19/2003-12:14pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/19/2003-11:37amDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 132.
03/19/2003-11:37amConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1976-1981)
03/19/2003-11:36amMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
03/18/2003Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 13.
03/18/2003Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-41.
03/12/2003Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 2.
03/12/2003Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/07/2003Subcommittee on the Constitution Discharged.
03/06/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
03/06/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/06/2003Introduced in House

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/12/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/12/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/12/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/18/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/06/2003 Referred to
03/12/2003 Markup by
03/18/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-41
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/06/2003 Referred to
03/07/2003 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Res.132.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Res.132. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/20/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the House on March 6, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) the phrase "one Nation, under God" in the Pledge of Allegiance to the Flag reflects that religious faith was central to the Founding Fathers and to the founding of the Nation; (2) reciting the Pledge, including that phrase, is a patriotic act, not an act or statement of religious faith or belief; (3) that phrase should remain in the Pledge and the practice of voluntarily reciting the pledge in public school classrooms should be encouraged by the policies of Congress, the various States, municipalities, and public school officials; and (4) the Elk Grove Unified School District in Elk Grove, California, should be commended for its continued support of the Pledge.

Declares that: (1) the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals ruling in Newdow v. United States Congress (which held that the inclusion of that phrase in the Pledge unconstitutionally endorses religion) is inconsistent with the Supreme Court's interpretation of the First Amendment; (2) the Attorney General should appeal, and the Supreme Court should review, that ruling; and (3) the President should nominate, and the Senate should confirm, Federal circuit court judges who interpret the Constitution consistent with the Constitution's text.