Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/27/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/11/2004