Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/30/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/16/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/16/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/17/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/17/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/18/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/21/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/03/2004