Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/29/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/01/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/22/2003