Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/12/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/12/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/12/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/12/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/12/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/10/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/18/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/18/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/24/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/09/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/24/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/01/2003