Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/22/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/12/2003