There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Senate should ratify the Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women (CEDAW).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/07/2003Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
01/07/2003Introduced in House

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/27/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/27/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/20/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/01/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations01/07/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.21.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/2003)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) the full realization of the rights of women is vital to the development and well-being of people of all nations; and (2) the Senate should, therefore, give its advice and consent to the ratification of the Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women.