Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/13/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/13/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/19/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/17/2004