Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/09/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2003