Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/09/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2003