Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/20/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/20/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/20/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/04/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/05/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/05/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/10/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/12/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/19/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2003