Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/05/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/05/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/16/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/02/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/20/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/20/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/05/2003