Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/21/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/23/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/02/2003