Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 07/10/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/05/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/17/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/17/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/30/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/21/2004