Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/17/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/17/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/22/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/24/2003