Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/01/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 10/01/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/01/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/02/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/02/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/02/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/17/2003