Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/15/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/28/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/28/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/28/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/28/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/29/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/29/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/29/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/29/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/30/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/30/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/30/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/30/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/07/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/17/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/19/2003