Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/21/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/28/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/28/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/2004