Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 10/29/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/30/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/30/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/05/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2003