Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/21/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/20/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 01/28/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/28/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/28/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/04/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/04/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/04/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/04/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/10/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/11/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/16/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/31/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/31/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/01/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/02/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/21/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/01/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/01/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/17/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/14/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/20/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/17/2004