Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/23/2004