Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/21/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/21/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/21/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/11/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/02/2004