Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/05/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/11/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/11/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/20/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2003