Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/27/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/27/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/28/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/04/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/04/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/10/2004