Text: H.Res.507 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (02/03/2004)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 507 Engrossed in House (EH)]


                 In the House of Representatives, U.S.,

                                                      February 3, 2004.
Whereas February 1, 2004, marks the one year anniversary of the accident that 
        claimed the Space Shuttle Columbia and the lives of seven heroic 
        astronauts that made up its crew;
Whereas, while in orbit, Columbia's experienced crew conducted important 
        microgravity research into the life sciences, physical sciences, and 
        space and earth sciences, in addition to promoting education 
        initiatives;
Whereas the Columbia experienced a structural failure that resulted in its 
        destruction over the States of Texas and Louisiana as it approached to 
        land on February 1, 2003;
Whereas the seven crew members of STS-107, Rick D. Husband (Commander), William 
        C. McCool (Pilot), Michael P. Anderson (Payload Commander), Kalpana 
        Chawla (Mission Specialist), David M. Brown (Mission Specialist), Laurel 
        B. Clark (Mission Specialist), and Ilan Ramon (Payload Specialist) 
        exhibited unparalleled bravery and commitment to the goal of exploring 
        space and advancing mankind's search for knowledge in the cosmos;
Whereas Rick Husband, 45, was a Colonel in the United States Air Force, a test 
        pilot, and a veteran of STS-96, and held degrees from Texas Tech 
        University and California State University, Fresno;
Whereas William C. McCool, 41, was a Commander in the United States Navy and 
        test pilot, and held degrees from the United States Naval Academy and 
        the University of Maryland;
Whereas Michael P. Anderson, 43, was a Lieutenant Colonel in the United States 
        Air Force, a former pilot instructor and tactical officer, and a veteran 
        of STS-89, and held degrees from the University of Washington and 
        Creighton University;
Whereas Kalpana Chawla, 41, was an aerospace engineer, a Federal Aviation 
        Administration Certified Flight Instructor, and a veteran of STS-87, and 
        held degrees from Punjab Engineering College (India), the University of 
        Texas at Arlington, and the University of Colorado, Boulder;
Whereas David M. Brown, 46, was a Captain in the United States Navy, a naval 
        aviator, and a naval flight surgeon, and held degrees from the College 
        of William and Mary and Eastern Virginia Medical School;
Whereas Laurel B. Clark, 41, was a Commander in the United States Navy and naval 
        flight surgeon, and held degrees from the University of Wisconsin, 
        Madison;
Whereas Ilan Ramon, 48, was a Colonel in the Israeli Air Force, a fighter pilot, 
        and Israel's first astronaut;
Whereas these brave astronauts will never be forgotten by the National 
        Aeronautics and Space Administration family and all those who believe in 
        the importance of exploring our universe; and
Whereas when the National Aeronautics and Space Administration's Mars 
        Exploration Rover (MER) Spirit landed on Mars on January 3, 2004, it 
        brought with it a small commemorative plaque bearing the names of the 
        seven astronauts, establishing an enduring memorial on another planet to 
        the fallen crew of Space Shuttle Columbia: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives does offer its gratitude to the 
seven Space Shuttle Columbia astronauts and its heartfelt sympathy to their 
families on the anniversary of their loss, with the reassurance that this 
sacrifice will not have been made in vain, but will strengthen this Nation's 
resolve to continue their journey of discovery.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.