Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/11/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/11/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/24/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/25/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/26/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/02/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/02/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/02/2004