Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/04/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/04/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/04/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/16/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/31/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/31/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/06/2004