Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/24/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/2004