Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/11/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/11/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/20/2004