Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/10/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/02/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/21/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/22/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/13/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/14/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/14/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/17/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/17/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/21/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2004