Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/16/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/29/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/30/2004