Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/23/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/23/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/23/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/25/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/29/2004