Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/25/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/25/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/25/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/25/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/25/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/25/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/21/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/27/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/27/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/27/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/12/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/21/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/2004