Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/09/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/09/2004