Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/07/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/07/2004